Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 6135 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | File Number 190 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 180 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |