Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00944 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 944
2-January Session, 2013 *_____SB00944ET____031413____*
1+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 944
2+January Session, 2013 LCO No. 3441
3+ *03441_______ET_*
4+Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY
5+Introduced by:
6+(ET)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 944
10+Raised Bill No. 944
711
812 January Session, 2013
913
10-*_____SB00944ET____031413____*
14+LCO No. 3441
15+
16+*03441_______ET_*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(ET)
1123
1224 AN ACT ESTABLISHING A PILOT PROGRAM TO ALLOW FOR MUNICIPAL AGGREGATION.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
16-Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) There is established a municipal electric aggregation pilot program for the purpose of negotiating the purchase of electric generation services from an electric supplier for all residential electric customers within the legal boundaries of a municipality. A municipality with a population of more than one hundred forty thousand that, on or before January 1, 2013, established an energy improvement district, as described in sections 32-80a to 32-80c, inclusive, of the general statutes, encompassing the entire municipality, may participate in said program by adopting an ordinance to form a municipal aggregation unit and, on or before January 1, 2014, filing such ordinance with the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority. Such ordinance shall specify the organizational structure of such unit.
28+Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) For purposes of this section, "municipal aggregation unit" means a municipality that serves as an electric aggregator for the purpose of negotiating the purchase of electric generation services from an electric supplier for all residential electric customers within the legal boundaries of such municipality. A municipal aggregation unit does not include a municipality served by a municipal electric utility that declined to participate in the competitive electric generation market prior to January 1, 2013.
1729
18-(b) A municipal aggregation unit may enroll residential electric customers in the municipal aggregation pilot program not earlier than July 1, 2014, and for a period of not more than two years. Said program shall allow residential electric customers who have not contracted with an electric supplier to opt out of the electric service offered by the municipal aggregation unit. Residential electric customers who have contracted with an electric supplier may opt in to the pilot program, provided nothing in this section shall affect or impair any existing contractual obligations with such supplier.
30+(b) There shall be established a municipal electric aggregation pilot program. A municipality with a population of more than one hundred forty thousand that, on or before January 1, 2013, established an energy improvement district, as described in sections 32-80a to 32-80c, inclusive, of the general statutes, encompassing the entire municipality, may participate in said program by adopting an ordinance to form a municipal aggregation unit. On or before January 1, 2014, such municipality shall file such ordinance with the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority. The authority may establish additional filing deadlines as it deems appropriate.
1931
20-(c) Not later than October 1, 2013, the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority shall initiate a proceeding to develop pilot program requirements which shall include, but not be limited to, the manner by which residential electric customers are provided (1) notice of enrollment in the pilot program, (2) information regarding rates and environmental characteristics of each category of energy source, (3) information regarding contract terms and conditions, and (4) notice regarding a customer's right to cancel service. A municipal aggregation unit shall provide residential electric customers not less than sixty days' notice prior to enrollment in the pilot program.
32+(c) The pilot program shall allow residential customers who have not contracted with an electric supplier to opt-out of the electric service offered by the municipal aggregation unit. Residential customers who have contracted with an electric supplier may opt-in to the pilot program notwithstanding any contract obligations with such supplier.
2133
22-(d) A municipal aggregation unit shall issue a request for proposals to licensed electric suppliers for the provision of electric generation service and select a bidder after providing a written analysis that the economic benefits will be equal to or exceed the current or projected economic benefits of receiving electric generation services through standard service. The municipal aggregation unit shall retain the services of a firm having expertise in electric aggregation and energy procurement to provide assistance with its participation in the pilot program, including, but not limited to, the development of its request for proposals. The municipal aggregation unit shall not be subject to the provisions of section 16-245s of the general statutes.
34+(d) Not later than October 1, 2013, the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority shall initiate a proceeding to develop a set of pilot program requirements which shall include, but not be limited to, the manner by which residential electric customers are provided (1) notice of the initiation of a pilot program, (2) information regarding rates and environmental characteristics, (3) information regarding contract terms and conditions, and (4) notice regarding a customer's right to cancel service. Such customers shall be given not less than sixty days' notice prior to the initiation of the pilot program.
2335
24-(e) Not later than January 1, 2016, the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority, in consultation with the Office of Consumer Counsel, shall submit, in accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, a report to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to energy concerning (1) the performance of the municipal electric aggregation pilot program, and (2) findings and recommendations as to whether (A) the time period for the pilot program should be extended, and (B) the pilot program should be expanded state-wide.
36+(e) The municipal aggregation unit shall issue a request for proposals to licensed electric suppliers for the provision of electric generation service and select a bidder after providing a written analysis that the economic benefits will be equal to or exceed the current or projected economic benefits of receiving electric generation services through standard service. Each municipal aggregation unit shall retain the services of a firm having expertise in electric aggregation and energy procurement to provide assistance with its participation in the pilot program, including, but not limited to, the development of its request for proposals. The municipal aggregation unit shall not be subject to the provisions of section 16-245s of the general statutes.
37+
38+(f) Not later than July 1, 2015, the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority, in consultation with the Office of Consumer Counsel, shall submit, in accordance with section 11-4a of the general statutes, a report regarding the performance of the municipal electric aggregation pilot program to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to energy. The report shall also include findings and recommendations regarding whether or not the time period for the pilot program should be extended, and whether or not the pilot program should be expanded state-wide.
2539
2640
2741
2842
2943 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3044 Section 1 from passage New section
3145
3246 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3347
3448 Section 1
3549
3650 from passage
3751
3852 New section
3953
54+Statement of Purpose:
4055
56+To establish a municipal electric aggregation pilot program that will operate as a customer opt-out of electric service program.
4157
42-ET Joint Favorable Subst.
43-
44-ET
45-
46-Joint Favorable Subst.
58+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]