Senate | 04/18/2013 | No Action | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Legislative Management | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | File Number 155 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 158 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |