Senate | 05/17/2013 | House Calendar Number 606 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | File Number 711 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 531 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |