Senate | 03/25/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |