Senate | 06/21/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/11/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/10/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/06/2013 | Public Act 13-157 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/31/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | House Calendar Number 593 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | File Number 542 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 399 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |