Senate | 05/23/2013 | File Number 841 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/22/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | File Number 318 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 238 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |