Senate | 06/05/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Public Act 13-75 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | House Calendar Number 616 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | File Number 714 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 532 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |