House | 04/11/2014 | Motion Failed JF | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | File Number 334 | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | House Calendar Number 196 | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/13/2014 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/10/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |