Senate | 05/02/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 545 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/01/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | File Number 44 | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | House Calendar Number 41 | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/24/2014 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/21/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |