House | 04/01/2014 | File Number 259 | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | House Calendar Number 166 | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/06/2014 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/05/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |