House | 04/24/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 449 | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/22/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | File Number 411 | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | House Calendar Number 246 | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/20/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/06/2014 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 03/05/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |