House | 04/02/2014 | File Number 306 | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | House Calendar Number 186 | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/07/2014 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 03/05/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |