Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Special Act 14-17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 5655
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
File Number 746
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 553
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4246
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
File Number 308
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
House Calendar Number 188
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|