Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
House Calendar Number 494
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A 4946
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4946
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
File Number 420
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
File Number 25
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 51
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|