Senate | 05/04/2014 | House Calendar Number 513 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | File Number 110 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 98 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |