Senate | 05/04/2014 | House Calendar Number 515 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4360 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | File Number 318 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 234 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |