Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Public Act 14-199
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
House Calendar Number 543
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5633
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
File Number 192
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 168
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|