Senate | 04/25/2014 | House Calendar Number 461 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/14/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | File Number 121 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 114 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |