Senate | 04/08/2014 | File Number 430 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 291 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/10/2014 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |