Senate | 04/24/2014 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/24/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | File Number 615 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 407 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/13/2014 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |