House | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/11/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/11/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/05/2015 | Public Act 15-77 | ||
House | 05/29/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/29/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 579 | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | File Number 395 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | House Calendar Number 253 | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/13/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |