House | 05/20/2015 | File Number 866 | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/19/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | File Number 622 | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | House Calendar Number 392 | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Vote to Draft |