LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2015 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05467
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05467
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2015 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05467
Action History
House
03/19/2015
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
House
03/18/2015
Drafted by Committee
House
03/03/2015
Vote to Draft
House
02/20/2015
Public Hearing 02/24
House
02/05/2015
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing