House | 02/06/2015 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/06/2015 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/04/2015 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on General Law | ||
House | 02/04/2015 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on General Law | ||
House | 02/03/2015 | Change of Reference General Law | ||
House | 01/26/2015 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Commerce | ||
House | 01/26/2015 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Commerce | ||
House | 01/23/2015 | Change of Reference Commerce | ||
House | 01/16/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |