House | 04/08/2015 | File Number 514 | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | House Calendar Number 320 | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/17/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Vote to Draft |