House | 04/16/2015 | File Number 670 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | House Calendar Number 432 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/13/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |