House | 06/16/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/11/2015 | Special Act 15-13 | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 390 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | File Number 314 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | House Calendar Number 196 | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | ||
House | 02/05/2015 | Vote to Draft |