House | 03/26/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Public Hearing 03/24 | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2015 | Vote to Draft |