House | 02/20/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/17/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/17/2015 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/06/2015 | Public Hearing 02/10 | ||
House | 01/30/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |