House | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | Public Act 15-65 | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 463 | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | File Number 187 | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | House Calendar Number 131 | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |