House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Public Act 15-170
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 577
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
File Number 123
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
House Calendar Number 98
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|