House
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Public Act 15-127
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
File Number 876
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 570
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7402
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
File Number 377
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
House Calendar Number 233
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|