House | 04/06/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |