House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Public Act 15-161
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
File Number 795
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 480
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6309
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
File Number 476
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
House Calendar Number 306
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|