House | 06/30/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/18/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/18/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Public Act 15-177 | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 481 | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | File Number 482 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | House Calendar Number 312 | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |