Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06978 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/15/2015

                            House Bill No. 6978

Public Act No. 15-177

AN ACT REQUIRING THE COMMISSIONER OF EDUCATION TO DEVELOP AND SUBMIT A COMPREHENSIVE STATE-WIDE INTERDISTRICT MAGNET SCHOOL PLAN. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: 

Section 1. Subdivision (1) of subsection (b) of section 10-264l of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2015): 

(b) (1) Applications for interdistrict magnet school program operating grants awarded pursuant to this section shall be submitted annually to the Commissioner of Education at such time and in such manner as the commissioner prescribes, except that on and after July 1, 2009, applications for such operating grants for new interdistrict magnet schools, other than those that the commissioner determines will assist the state in meeting the goals of the 2008 stipulation and order for Milo Sheff, et al. v. William A. O'Neill, et al. , as extended, or the goals of the 2013 stipulation and order for Milo Sheff, et al. v. William A. O'Neill, et al. , shall not be accepted until the commissioner develops a comprehensive state-wide interdistrict magnet school plan. The commissioner shall submit such comprehensive state-wide interdistrict magnet school plan on or before [January 1, 2011] October 1, 2016, to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education.