House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Public Act 15-180
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
File Number 854
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 531
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7266
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
File Number 591
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
House Calendar Number 381
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/17
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|