Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
Public Act 15-184
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 611
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
File Number 911
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8361
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
File Number 820
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
House Calendar Number 547
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Public Hearing 04/21
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|