Senate | 04/14/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | File Number 60 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 97 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/23/2015 | Vote to Draft |