Senate | 05/11/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Public Act 15-4 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | House Calendar Number 417 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | File Number 542 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 331 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Public Hearing 03/16 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Vote to Draft |