Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | File Number 88 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 121 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |