House
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Public Act 15-135
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
File Number 912
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8276
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
House Calendar Number 419
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
File Number 550
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 313
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|