Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | File Number 436 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 280 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Vote to Draft |