20 | | - | (c) Between October 1, 2015, and September 30, 2016, each selected municipal police department shall require the selected police officers to use body-worn video recording equipment in a manner consistent with the policies adopted pursuant to subsection (b) of this section. |
---|
| 32 | + | (c) On or before November 1, 2016, each selected municipal police department shall submit a report to the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection regarding the pilot program established by this section. Such report shall include, but is not limited to, (1) a description of the different types of video recording equipment used by the municipal police department, (2) the policies established by such department regarding the use of video recording equipment and the storage, retention, destruction and disclosure of videos, (3) the number of complaints alleging unprofessional conduct by a police officer made during the pilot program compared to the number of complaints made during the twelve months before the pilot program, (4) the number of incidents when a police officer used force during the pilot program compared to the number of incidents when a police officer used force during the twelve months before the pilot program, and (5) general observations by the municipal police department, police officers and the public concerning the pilot program. |
---|
22 | | - | (d) On or before November 30, 2016, each selected municipal police department shall submit a report to the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection regarding the pilot program established by this section. Such report shall include, but is not limited to, (1) a description of the different types of body-worn video recording equipment used by the municipal police department, (2) the policies adopted by the municipal police department pursuant to subsection (b) of this section, (3) the number of complaints alleging unprofessional conduct by a police officer made during the pilot program compared to the number of complaints made during the twelve months before the pilot program, (4) the number of incidents when a police officer used force during the pilot program compared to the number of incidents when a police officer used force during the twelve months before the pilot program, and (5) general observations by the municipal police department, police officers and the public concerning the pilot program. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | (e) On or before January 31, 2017, the Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection shall submit a report in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public safety and security. Such report shall include, but is not limited to, (1) a summary of the information obtained from the municipal police departments pursuant to subsection (d) of this section, (2) model policies regarding the use of body-worn video recording equipment by police officers and the storage, review, retention, destruction and disclosure of videos, and (3) recommendations regarding the continuation, termination or expansion of the pilot program. |
---|
| 34 | + | (d) On or before January 1, 2017, the Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection shall submit a report in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public safety and security. Such report shall include, but is not limited to, (1) a summary of the information obtained from the municipal police departments pursuant to subsection (c) of this section, (2) model policies regarding the use of video recording equipment by police officers and the storage, retention, destruction and disclosure of videos, and (3) recommendations regarding the continuation, termination or expansion of the pilot program. |
---|
46 | | - | Joint Favorable Subst. |
---|
| 60 | + | Co-Sponsors: |
---|
| 61 | + | |
---|
| 62 | + | SEN. LOONEY, 11th Dist.; SEN. DUFF, 25th Dist. |
---|
| 63 | + | |
---|
| 64 | + | SEN. CASSANO, 4th Dist.; SEN. COLEMAN, 2nd Dist. |
---|
| 65 | + | |
---|
| 66 | + | SEN. CRISCO, 17th Dist.; SEN. LEONE, 27th Dist. |
---|
| 67 | + | |
---|
| 68 | + | SEN. MOORE, 22nd Dist.; SEN. SLOSSBERG, 14th Dist. |
---|
| 69 | + | |
---|
| 70 | + | SEN. WINFIELD, 10th Dist.; REP. ADAMS, 146th Dist. |
---|
| 71 | + | |
---|
| 72 | + | S.B. 770 |
---|