Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | File Number 697 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 416 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |