Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Children | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | File Number 92 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 109 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |