Senate | 05/07/2015 | House Calendar Number 513 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | File Number 34 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 82 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |