Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-233
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 615
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7823
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Aging
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Aging
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
File Number 294
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 223
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|