Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00896 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2015

Chaptered

Bill June 17, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill March 30, 2015